MA S2730 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2830
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to address challenges faced by restaurants and other establishments due to COVID-19. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To address challenges faced by restaurants and other establishments due to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2830 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Read second |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2830 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2020 from 01:30 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2830 (Replaced by) 2020-07-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2730.pdf |