MA S2725 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1507
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to monitor dry casks of spent nuclear fuel; and of Josh S. Cutler, Kathleen R. LaNatra and others relative to the reporting of spent nuclear fuel at certain electricity generating facilities, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2725).
Title
Relative to monitoring dry casks of spent nuclear fuel
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-28 | Senate | New draft of S1507 and H2254 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1507 (Replaces) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H1686 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H2254 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H1686 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H2254 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2725 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2725.pdf |