MA S2699 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to special police in the town of Weston. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to special police in the town of Weston

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-09-14HouseRules suspended
2020-09-14HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2020-06-25HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-06-18SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-06-18SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2020-06-04SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-06-04SenateRules suspended
2020-06-04SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2020-05-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing
2020-05-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-05-11SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback