MA S2698 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1336
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists, reports recommending that the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2698) ought to pass.
Title
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-05-11 | Senate | New draft of S1336 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1336 (Replaces) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2698
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2698 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2698.pdf |