MA S2688 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Marc Wedgeworth, an employee of the Massachusetts Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Marc Wedgeworth, an employee of the Massachusetts Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2018-12-17 | House | House concurred |
2018-11-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2018-11-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2688 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2688.pdf |