MA S2679 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Ms. L'Italien, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Barbara A. L'Italien to establish a sick leave bank for Robert Socha, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Robert Socha, an employee of the Department of Correction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-01-01HouseNo further action taken
2018-12-28HouseRules suspended
2018-12-28HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-27HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-27SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-27SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-12-13SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2018-12-03HouseHouse concurred
2018-11-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2018-11-15SenateRules suspended
2018-08-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback