MA S2660 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S606

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2660).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting continuity of care for Multiple Sclerosis treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-04-27SenateNew draft of S606
2020-04-27SenateReported from the committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S606 (Replaces) 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback