MA S2658 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide emergency assistance for municipal public safety overtime. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Providing emergency assistance for municipal public safety overtime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-23 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2658 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2658.pdf |