MA S2607 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to stop mass shootings. The Judiciary.
Title
To stop mass shootings
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S3063 |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-25 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday July 29, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-30 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-23 | House | House concurred |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S3063 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1549 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S3063 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1251 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1549 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2607 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2607.pdf |