MA S2604 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Trek Reef, an employee of the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Trek Reef, an employee of the Department of Conservation and Recreation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2604 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2604.pdf |