MA S2602 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-14)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Recommitted to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to emergency hazard health duty. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency hazard health duty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateRecommitted to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2020-04-30SenateRules suspended
2020-04-30SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2020-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/06/2020 from 05:00 PM-05:01 PM in State House
2020-03-18HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-17SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2020-03-17SenateRules suspended
2020-03-12SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback