MA S2597 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Sutton to grant real property abatements to certain military personnel. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Sutton to grant real property abatements to certain military personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2620 |
2018-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-07-12 | House | House concurred |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
S2620 (Replaced by) 2018-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed on the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
S2620 (Replaced by) 2018-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed on the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2597 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2597.pdf |