MA S2582 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Tewksbury to lease the Louise Davy Trahan Elementary School for not more than 99 years
Title
Authorizing the town of Tewksbury to lease the Louise Davy Trahan Elementary School for not more than 99 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-03-14 | House | Enacted |
2024-03-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-08 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | New draft (Finegold) of S2485 |
Same As/Similar To
S2485 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - New draft (Finegold) substituted, see S2582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2582 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2582.pdf |