MA S2572 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2584
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2584
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing barriers to care for mental health
Title
Addressing barriers to care for mental health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #114 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #113 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #112 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #113 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #112 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S2584 |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read third |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S1276 |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #68 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #69 (Pacheco) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Creem) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Fattman) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Lesser) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Creem) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Cronin) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #76 (Tarr) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #75 (Feeney) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #73 (Feeney) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #72 (Feeney) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #71 (Feeney) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #70 (Feeney) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #66 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #64 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #63 (Keenan) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #62 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #61 (Keenan) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #60 (Keenan) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #59 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #58 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #57 (Keenan) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #56 (Keenan) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #54 (Chandler) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #53 (Chandler) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #51 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #113 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #49 (Lesser) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #47 (DiZoglio) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #46 (DiZoglio) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #45 (DiDomenico) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Montigny) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Moran) adopted -see Roll Call #112 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Cronin) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Crighton) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Tarr) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Crighton) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Eldridge) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Collins) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Comerford) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Comerford) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Comerford) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Comerford) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Lesser) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Lesser) rejected |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Cronin) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Jehlen) adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Eldridge) adopted |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1276 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1276 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2572
S2584 (Replaced by) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
S2584 (Replaced by) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4879 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Published as amended, see H4891
H4891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - H4879, published as amended
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022