MA S2488 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2719
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update and decrease a carbon emissions limit that achieves at least net zero statewide greenhouse gas emissions. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Updating and decreasing carbon emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2719 |
2024-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-12-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2024 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-10-26 | House | House concurred |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Referred to the committee on and referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2488.pdf |