MA S2483 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4832

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4832
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure the responsible use of advanced robotic technologies. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure the responsible use of advanced robotic technologies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-10HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4832
2024-05-22HouseHouse concurred
2024-05-20SenateReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-16HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-10-19HouseHouse concurred
2023-09-28SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2023-09-28SenateRules suspended
2023-09-14SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4103 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4832
H4832 (Replaced by) 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback