MA S2482 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2436
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-25 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-25 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide property tax exemptions for certain nonprofit senior housing in Boxford, report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2482).
Title
Revenue study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Accompanied by S2436 |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Replaces) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2482
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2482 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2482.pdf |