MA S2478 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regard transfer of retained earnings surplus in the town of Clinton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding transfer of retained earnings surplus in the town of Clinton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-24 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-02 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-24 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2479 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2018
H4973 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4994
H4994 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2018
H4973 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4994
H4994 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2478.pdf |