MA S2471 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to youth voter engagement. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to youth voter engagement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-21 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2471 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2471.pdf |