MA S2466 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the commonwealth's direct-care workforce for elderly and disabled consumers” (Senate, No. 2466).
Title
Relative to the commonwealth's direct-care workforce for elderly and disabled consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-27 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-27 | Senate | Substituted for S77 |
2016-07-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-27 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S77 |
2016-07-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S77 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2466
S84 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1432
S826 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1133 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1922 (Similar To) 2015-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S45 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016
S2156 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S54 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1903 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S84 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1432
S826 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1133 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1922 (Similar To) 2015-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S45 (Similar To) 2016-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016
S2156 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S54 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
S490 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1903 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2466.pdf |