MA S2457 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sealing of records pursuant to Section 100C of Chapter 276. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to sealing of records pursuant to Section 100C of Chapter 276
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-10-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2020-01-02 | House | House concurred |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2457.pdf |