MA S2455 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Alison Neas, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Alison Neas, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-01-13SenateRules suspended
2020-01-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2020-01-02HouseHouse concurred
2019-12-09SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2019-12-09SenateRules suspended
2019-12-05SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback