MA S2440 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve student and staff attendance and performance by ensuring CO2 monitoring in schools throughout the Commonwealth. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve student and staff attendance and performance by ensuring CO2 monitoring in schools throughout the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied S242
2023-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-08-14HouseHouse concurred
2023-07-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education
2023-07-13SenateRules suspended
2023-06-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S242 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback