MA S244 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2590

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to fairly reimburse local school transportation of foster children. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairly reimbursing local school transportation of foster children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-09SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2590
2023-10-20JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H3570 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4422
H4236 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2590 (Replaced by) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2686 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Reprinted as amended, see S2694

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback