MA S2432 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for a study of noise impacts from the confluence of Interstate 495 and Route 28. Transportation.
Title
To provide for a study of noise impacts from the confluence of Interstate 495 and Route 28
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-27 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2432 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2432.pdf |