MA S2430 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure equity in healthcare access for veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to ensuring equity in healthcare access for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2430.pdf |