MA S2389 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to facilitate restitution against unfinished development to be known as the FRAUD Act. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating restitution against unfinished development to be known as the FRAUD Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09JointHearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-22SenateSenate receded from its referral to the committee on the Judiciary and concurred in the reference to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2023-05-22SenateRules suspended
2023-05-18HouseHouse NON-concurred in the reference to the committee on the Judiciary and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2023-05-18HouseRules suspended
2023-05-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2023-05-15SenateRules suspended
2023-04-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S1829 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2656
H1587 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H2862 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H1461 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback