MA S2377 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2642

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to develop, design and implement a redesigned registration plate system for motor vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance the license plate system of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2642
2022-01-20JointHearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H4020 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2022
H4059 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Senate concurred
S2529 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence
S791 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - House concurred
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S217 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S464 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H514 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback