MA S2371 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank Tiffany Myers, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tiffany Myers, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Correction
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2019-10-15 | House | House concurred |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2019
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
H2263 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
H2263 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2371 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2371.pdf |