MA S2363 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve health and safety standards at state-operated veterans' homes. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve health and safety standards at state-operated veterans' homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S364 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3929
H2009 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H513 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
H517 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4400
H2130 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback