MA S2339 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to to amend the general officer designation in the state staff of the militia. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To amend the general officer designation in the state staff of the militia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3529 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2339 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2339.pdf |