MA S2326 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4037

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Spring Grove Cemetery in the town of Andover. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Spring Grove Cemetery in the town of Andover

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2019-12-09HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-12-06SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2019-12-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-10-17SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-09-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-09-25SenateAccompanied by H4037
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-09-05HouseHouse concurred
2019-09-03SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4038 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2300 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4009 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
H4077 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2019
H4037 (Replaces) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied S2326
H2953 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1200 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2504 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S90 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1199 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2019
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4198 (Similar To) 2019-12-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4221 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback