MA S2304 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2585

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect residents from hazardous traffic conditions. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to protecting residents from hazardous traffic conditions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2585
2023-11-08JointHearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2585 (Replaced by) 2024-02-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4114 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4733
S2436 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4226 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback