MA S2294 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tolls on the roadways of the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Relative to tolls on the roadways of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2621 |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
S2339 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2094 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2621 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3473 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3472 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
S2339 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2094 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2621 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3473 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3472 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2294 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2294.pdf |