MA S2290 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the orange line extension. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the orange line extension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-05-08JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-05JointHearing rescheduled to 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-04-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4778 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4794 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4793 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4872 (Similar To) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback