MA S2281 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Town of Windsor to continue the employment of Police Chief Thomas Barnaby. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Windsor to reinstate Police Chief Thomas J. Barnaby

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2016
2017-01-03SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-01-03HouseEnacted
2017-01-03SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2017-01-03SenateRules suspended
2017-01-03HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2016-11-10HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-11-10HouseRules suspended
2016-11-10HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-10-11HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-10-06SenateRead third, amended (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2016-10-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2016-06-28SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-06-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2016-05-16JointHearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in 222
2016-05-09HouseHouse concurred
2016-05-05SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1687 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S107 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1002 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1329 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S85 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S2319 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1468 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4231
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S853 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H1719 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H1759 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback