MA S2271 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3819

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - See H3819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Similar Bills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Similar Bills

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSee H3819
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted as a new text for H3819
2019-06-20SenateRules suspended
2019-06-20SenateRecommended new text for (residue) H3819
2019-06-20SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3819 (Replaced by) 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2019
H3910 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2019
H3958 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Text of an amendment, see H3819

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback