MA S2268 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve headlight safety. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to improved headlight safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4002 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4635 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2872 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 12:55 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2884 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback