MA S2226 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for building justice with jobs. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Providing for building justice with jobs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3365 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2226.pdf |