MA S2210 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to anaerobic digestion. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to anaerobic digestion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S516 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3312 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S567 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54
S2184 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2141 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3312 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4089 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S567 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5163 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5180 for section 54
S2184 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2141 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2210 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2210.pdf |