MA S2205 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to facilitate cost efficient transportation. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating cost efficient transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-31SenateNo further action taken
2024-03-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-03-07SenateAccompanied by H3271
2023-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3271 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2205

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback