MA S2199 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the statutory responsibilities of the Department of Public Utilities and establishing a commission on transportation safety oversight and regulation. Transportation.
Title
Amending the statutory responsibilities of the Department of Public Utilities and establishing a commission on transportation safety oversight and regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
Sen. Nick Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-09-05 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-07-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 22, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-08 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2829 (Similar To) 2024-06-25 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2838
S2838 (Similar To) 2024-10-23 - Reported by S2967
S2829 (Similar To) 2024-06-25 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2838
S2838 (Similar To) 2024-10-23 - Reported by S2967
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2199.pdf |