MA S2197 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2185

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-26 - See S2185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Similar Bills

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Similar Bills

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-26SenateSee S2185

Same As/Similar To

S2185 (Replaced by) 2017-10-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2200
H888 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2276 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1313 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3611 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2308 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback