MA S2184 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to anaerobic digestion and agricultural energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to anaerobic digestion and agricultural energy
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2210 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2216 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S2141 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3260 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2219 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2210 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3311 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2155 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2153 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2216 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
S590 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2738
S2141 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3260 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2219 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2184.pdf |