MA S2180 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2719

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure adequate and affordable energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure adequate and affordable energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2719
2024-04-03HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S564 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S1830 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2464 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - New draft substituted, see S2691
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2024
S2719 (Replaced by) 2024-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback