MA S2177 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance water access equity through utility reporting requirements. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Advancing water access equity through utility reporting requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H922 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2177 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2177.pdf |