MA S212 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2733
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support access to training on reproductive and gender-affirming care. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Supporting access to training on reproductive and gender-affirming care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2733 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2619 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - New draft substituted, see S2697
S2597 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2707 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2680 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2733 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2597 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2707 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2680 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2733 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S212 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S212.pdf |