MA S2110 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fusion energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to fusion energy
Sponsors
Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2531 (Similar To) 2023-12-29 - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2024 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-12-29 - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2024 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Hearing rescheduled to 02/27/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4439 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-12-29 - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2024 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Hearing rescheduled to 02/27/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2691 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4439 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2110.pdf |