MA S2102 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote equality and respect in the legislature. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Promoting equality and respect in the legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2620 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2620 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3239 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2620 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3239 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2102 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2102.pdf |