MA S2098 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to debar employers who violate federal immigration laws from contracting with the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To debar employers who violate certain federal laws from contracting with the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H1942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H3133 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H3107 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2021 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H1942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H3133 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H3107 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2021 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2098 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2098.pdf |